WA SB5168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying notice and opportunity provisions relating to certain enforcement actions taken by a homeowners' or condominium association.
Title
Modifying notice and opportunity provisions relating to certain enforcement actions taken by a homeowners' or condominium association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |