WA SB5175 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning firefighter safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning firefighter safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-19SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-19SenateChapter 76, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-19SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-16SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-12SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-06HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-06HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-25HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-04SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM.
2019-01-31SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5175&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5175.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5175-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5175-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5175-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117552&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5175&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117552&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5175&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback