WA SB5183 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019**.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning relocation assistance for manufactured/mobile home park tenants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning relocation assistance for manufactured/mobile home park tenants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateEffective date 7/28/2019**.
2019-05-13SenateChapter 390, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-13SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-28SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 36; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-28SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-27HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-26HousePlaced on second reading.
2019-04-25HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-25HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-25HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 6:00 PM.
2019-04-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2019-04-22SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-22SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-22SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-22Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-19SenateMoved to Rules White Sheet.
2019-03-18SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2019-02-27SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-25SenateWM - Majority; without recommendation.
2019-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateHSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.

Same As/Similar To

HB1033 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5183&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5183.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5183-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5183-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5183-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5183-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117560&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5183&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117560&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5183&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117560&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-28-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5183&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback