WA SB5187 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting clay targets from sales and use tax.
Title
Exempting clay targets from sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |