WA SB5205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning provisions governing firearms possession by persons who have been found incompetent to stand trial and who have a history of one or more violent acts.
Title
Concerning provisions governing firearms possession by persons who have been found incompetent to stand trial and who have a history of one or more violent acts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 248, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 32; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |