WA SB5206 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for certain feminine hygiene products.
Title
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for certain feminine hygiene products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5206&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5206.pdf |