WA SB5217 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning industrial insurance wage loss.
Title
Concerning industrial insurance wage loss.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1492 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5217&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5217.pdf |