WA SB5218 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mobile food units.
Title
Concerning mobile food units.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 185, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-22 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |