WA SB5221 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning disclosure of contributions from political committees to other political committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning disclosure of contributions from political committees to other political committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-11HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-07HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-21HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-02-20SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-20SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-30SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-30SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback