WA SB5224 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning advisory votes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning advisory votes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-19HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-19HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-04HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-06SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback