WA SB5228 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the authorization to impose special excise taxes on the sale of lodging.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the authorization to impose special excise taxes on the sale of lodging.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-04HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Finance.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseLG - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2019-03-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-31SenateLGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-31SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Local Government.

Same As/Similar To

HB1242 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback