WA SB5234 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the excise tax for medical marijuana patients with recognition cards for products identified as beneficial for medical use.
Title
Modifying the excise tax for medical marijuana patients with recognition cards for products identified as beneficial for medical use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5234&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5234.pdf |