WA SB5236 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging apprenticeships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging apprenticeships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-27HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-27HouseCWD - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to College & Workforce Development.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-25SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-25SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-28SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback