WA SB5247 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing catastrophic incidents that are natural or human-caused emergencies by providing guidance that may be used by state public schools to plan for seismic catastrophic incidents.
Title
Addressing catastrophic incidents that are natural or human-caused emergencies by providing guidance that may be used by state public schools to plan for seismic catastrophic incidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-25 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-27 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1200 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.