WA SB5258 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Preventing the sexual harassment and sexual assault of certain isolated workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preventing the sexual harassment and sexual assault of certain isolated workers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 73 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-13SenateChapter 392, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-13SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-25HousePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 73; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee report; received 4:30 PM 4/25/2019.
2019-04-25HouseConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-25HouseConference committee report; received 3:26 PM 4/25/2019.
2019-04-23HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Frame, Mosbrucker, Sells.
2019-04-23HouseConference committee request granted.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee appointed. Senators King, Keiser, Conway.
2019-04-18SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon.
2019-04-10HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 35; absent, 35; excused, 6.
2019-04-10HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-10HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-02HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-04-01HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-25HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-02-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-13SenateFloor amendment
2019-02-13Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-01-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-01-24SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-24SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-24SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1728 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5258&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5258.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5258-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5258-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5258-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5258-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117712&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5258&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117712&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-10-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5258&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117712&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5258&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117712&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5258&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback