WA SB5259 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging the success of agriculture on agricultural land.
Title
Encouraging the success of agriculture on agricultural land.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] |
Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |