WA SB5260 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning powers to waive statutory obligations or limitations during a state of emergency in order to cope with the emergency.
Title
Concerning powers to waive statutory obligations or limitations during a state of emergency in order to cope with the emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 472, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee amendment |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-22 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |