WA SB5263 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning school bus driver requirements.
Title
Concerning school bus driver requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-28 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |