WA SB5265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the role of volunteerism within state government.
Title
Concerning the role of volunteerism within state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 45, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-02 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |