WA SB5266 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 5/21/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning timely elections for governing body members in jurisdictions modifying districting plans under the Washington voting rights act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning timely elections for governing body members in jurisdictions modifying districting plans under the Washington voting rights act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 5/21/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 454, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-23SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-22HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-11HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-27HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-02-26SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-02-26SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-26Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-05SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-01SenateSGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5266&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5266.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5266-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5266-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5266-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117720&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5266&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117720&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5266&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117720&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5266&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback