WA SB5272 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Vacating convictions arising from offenses committed as a result of being a victim of trafficking, promoting prostitution, or promoting commercial sexual abuse of a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vacating convictions arising from offenses committed as a result of being a victim of trafficking, promoting prostitution, or promoting commercial sexual abuse of a minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-04-25SenateChapter 128, 2017 Laws.
2017-04-25SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-18SenateDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-06SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2017-04-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-03-31HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-03-17HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-16HousePS - Majority; do pass.
2017-03-16HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:30 AM.
2017-03-09HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:30 AM.
2017-02-23HouseFirst reading, referred to Public Safety
2017-02-22SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-02-22SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-22Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2017-02-21SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-17SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-16SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-16SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2017-02-14SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Same As/Similar To

HB1112 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Public Safety.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback