WA SB5274 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Effective date 7/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning private motorcycle skills education programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning private motorcycle skills education programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-22SenateEffective date 7/1/2013.
2013-04-22SenateChapter 33, 2013 Laws.
2013-04-22SenateGovernor signed.
2013-04-16SenateDelivered to Governor.
2013-04-16HouseSpeaker signed.
2013-04-11SenatePresident signed.
2013-04-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2013-04-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-04-10HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-04-08HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2013-04-02HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-03-28HouseTR - Majority; do pass.
2013-03-28HouseTR - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2013-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2013-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation
2013-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2013-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-03-04Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2013-02-27SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-02-25SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2013-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-06SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2013-02-05SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2013-01-29SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2013-01-24SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1379 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Transportation.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback