WA SB5274 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Revising the responsibilities of the joint administrative rules review committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revising the responsibilities of the joint administrative rules review committee.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2016-02-25SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2016-01-19SenateMoved to Rules White Sheet.
2016-01-11SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-06-28SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-05-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-04-29SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2015-03-23SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2015-03-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2015-02-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2015-02-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2015-02-19SenateEET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2015-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
2015-02-17SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
2015-01-22SenateReferred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
2015-01-21SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2015-01-21SenateAnd refer to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
2015-01-21SenateACRE - Majority; without recommendation.
2015-01-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Accountability & Reform at 8:00 AM.
2015-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Accountability and Reform .

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback