WA SB5274 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Defining salary for purposes of the Washington state patrol retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Defining salary for purposes of the Washington state patrol retirement system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateEffective date 7/23/2017.
2017-05-04SenateChapter 181, 2017 Laws.
2017-05-04SenateGovernor signed.
2017-04-21SenateDelivered to Governor.
2017-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-04-19SenatePresident signed.
2017-04-17SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-04-17SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2017-04-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2017-04-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-04-07HouseCommittee amendment
2017-04-06HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-04-04HouseTR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-04-04HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM.
2017-03-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Transportation.
2017-03-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-03-23HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2017-03-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-03-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2017-03-03HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations
2017-03-01SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2017-03-01SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2017-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2017-02-24SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2017-02-23SenateTRAN - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-23SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-22SenateReferred to Transportation.
2017-02-21SenateAnd refer to Transportation.
2017-02-21SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2017-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-19SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

HB1707 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback