WA SB5274 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning dental coverage for Pacific islanders residing in Washington.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning dental coverage for Pacific islanders residing in Washington.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 59 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-08SenateChapter 311, 2019 Laws PV.
2019-05-08SenateGovernor partially vetoed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-26SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-25SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-24HouseHouse insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
2019-04-19SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 59; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-09HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-04-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2019-03-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1.
2019-03-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-13SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-06SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-06SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1218 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-17 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5274&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5274.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5274.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5274.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5274.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117730&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5274&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117730&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5274&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117730&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-25-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5274&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback