WA SB5284 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning smoke detection devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning smoke detection devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019*.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 455, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseCPB - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-08Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-21SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-21SenateFIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM.
2019-01-16SenateFirst reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade.

Same As/Similar To

HB1103 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-14 - First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5284&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5284.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5284-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5284-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5284-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5284-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5284-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117740&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5284&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117740&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5284&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117740&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5284&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback