WA SB5287 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring accurate redistricting.
Title
Ensuring accurate redistricting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 456, 2019 Laws PV. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |