WA SB5288 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Sentencing for persistent offenders.
Title
Sentencing for persistent offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Chapter 187, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 45; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |