WA SB5294 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creating leave provisions for legislative service.
Title
Creating leave provisions for legislative service.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 31; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-03 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |