WA SB5297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending collective bargaining rights to assistant attorneys general.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extending collective bargaining rights to assistant attorneys general.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-04-26SenateChapter 145, 2019 Laws.
2019-04-26SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-22SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-15SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-12HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-08HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-26HouseLAWS - Majority; do pass.
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
2019-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Commerce.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-29SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-29SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-29SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-29SenateLBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-29SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-24SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.

Same As/Similar To

HB1299 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5297&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5297.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5297-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5297-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5297-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117788&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5297&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117788&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5297&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback