WA SB5299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning impaired driving.
Title
Concerning impaired driving.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |