WA SB5303 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing motorcycle safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing motorcycle safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-22SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-20SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-20SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1116 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-19 - Effective date 1/1/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback