WA SB5304 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the financing of local infrastructure.
Title
Concerning the financing of local infrastructure.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1441 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for third reading.