WA SB5315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing student support staff in the prototypical school funding model.
Title
Increasing student support staff in the prototypical school funding model.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |