WA SB5322 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Ensuring compliance with the federal clean water act by prohibiting certain discharges into waters of the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring compliance with the federal clean water act by prohibiting certain discharges into waters of the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2019-04-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-02HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-03-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-28HouseENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 9:00 AM.
2019-03-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.
2019-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-04SenateFloor amendment
2019-03-04Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-20SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-20SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-20SenateENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.

Same As/Similar To

HB1261 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback