WA SB5324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning support for students experiencing homelessness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning support for students experiencing homelessness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-21SenateChapter 412, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-26SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-25SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-23SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-23SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-12HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-12HouseCommittee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-26HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-08HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-03-06SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-06SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-06Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-04SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-04SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-17SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB1263 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5324&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5324.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5324-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5324-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5324-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117850&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-06-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5324&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117850&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-12-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5324&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117850&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-23-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5324&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback