WA SB5336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Advancing electric transportation.
Title
Advancing electric transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1664 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.