WA SB5338 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning the protection of vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration; referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1422 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.