WA SB5352 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 6/30/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 6/30/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Walla Walla watershed management pilot program.
Title
Concerning the Walla Walla watershed management pilot program.
Sponsors
Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | Senate | Effective date 6/30/2019. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Chapter 78, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-08 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-04-02 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1013 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.