WA SB5354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning programs for highly capable students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning programs for highly capable students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-28HouseED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-25HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-18SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-18SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-18SenateEDU - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 12:30 PM.
2019-02-06SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Same As/Similar To

HB1641 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Referred to Appropriations.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback