WA SB5360 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Addressing plan membership default provisions in the public employees' retirement system, the teachers' retirement system, and the school employees' retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Addressing plan membership default provisions in the public employees' retirement system, the teachers' retirement system, and the school employees' retirement system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-08SenateChapter 313, 2019 Laws PV.
2019-05-08SenateGovernor partially vetoed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-26SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 73; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-15HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-01HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2019-04-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to Appropriations.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-26SenateMade eligible to be placed on second reading.
2019-02-06SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-04SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-04SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-04SenateWM - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-04SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-30SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Same As/Similar To

HB1308 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5360&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5360.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5360.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5360.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117912&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-08-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5360&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117912&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5360&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117912&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5360&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback