WA SB5366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the property tax exemption for new and rehabilitated multiple-unit dwellings in urban centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding the property tax exemption for new and rehabilitated multiple-unit dwellings in urban centers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans.
2019-03-12SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-03-12SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-12Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-09SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-21SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-01-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-01-28SenateHSA - Majority; do pass.
2019-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-23SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback