WA SB5370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a state commercial aviation coordinating commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a state commercial aviation coordinating commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateEffective date 7/28/2019.
2019-05-13SenateChapter 396, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-13SenateGovernor signed.
2019-05-01SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-28SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-27HousePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-27HouseConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-25HouseConference committee report; received 5:14 PM 4/25/2019.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee report; received 5:10 PM 4/25/2019.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee appointed. Senators Keiser, Saldaa, Warnick.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee request granted.
2019-04-23HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Dent, Fey, Orwall.
2019-04-23HouseHouse insists on its position and asks Senate for a conference.
2019-04-18SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseFloor amendment
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-12HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseTR - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-04-01HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-03-12HouseFirst reading, referred to Transportation.
2019-03-11SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-03-11SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-11Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-28SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-19SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-18SenateTRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-18SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-04SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Transportation.

Same As/Similar To

HB1683 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5370&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5370.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5370-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5370-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5370-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117932&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-11-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5370&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117932&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5370&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117932&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5370&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117932&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-27-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5370&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback