WA SB5375 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing trust companies to be organized as, or convert to, limited liability companies under certain conditions.
Title
Allowing trust companies to be organized as, or convert to, limited liability companies under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-13 | Chapter 52, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-13 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-06 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-04 | President signed. | |
2011-04-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2011-04-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-11 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-08 | BFS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-08 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-08 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. | |
2011-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 3; excused, 1. | |
2011-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-03 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-02 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-21 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1466 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.