WA SB5375 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the cancer research endowment authority to the Andy Hill cancer research endowment.
Title
Renaming the cancer research endowment authority to the Andy Hill cancer research endowment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Chapter 4, 2018 Laws. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-01-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-01-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2018-01-22 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2018-01-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-01-16 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules Green Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-22 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM. |
2017-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |