WA SB5377 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning data sales and governance.
Title
Concerning data sales and governance.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |