WA SB5380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning opioid use disorder treatment, prevention, and related services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning opioid use disorder treatment, prevention, and related services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Recommended by Conference Committee (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Final Passage as recommended by the Conference Committee (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateEffective date 7/28/2019*.
2019-05-08SenateChapter 314, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-08SenateGovernor signed.
2019-04-29SenateDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-27SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-26SenatePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2019-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-26HousePassed final passage as recommended by conference committee; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted.
2019-04-25SenateConference committee report; received 4:50 PM 4/25/2019.
2019-04-25HouseConference committee report; received 3:29 PM 4/25/2019.
2019-04-23HouseConference committee appointed. Representatives Cody, Macri, Schmick.
2019-04-23HouseConference committee request granted.
2019-04-19SenateConference committee appointed. Senators Cleveland, Dhingra, O'Ban.
2019-04-19SenateSenate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House for conference thereon.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment
2019-04-16HouseAmendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill.
2019-04-16HouseCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-11HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-04-08HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-08HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-04-02HouseHCW - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-03-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 1.
2019-03-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-07Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-28SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-02-26SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health & Long Term Care.
2019-02-26SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-19SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-11SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-08SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-08SenateHLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-08SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-25SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.

Same As/Similar To

HB1331 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5380&year=2019
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5380.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5380-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/5380-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/5380-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117973&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5380&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117973&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-16-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5380&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117973&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5380&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=117973&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-26-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=5380&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback