WA SB5383 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tiny houses.
Title
Concerning tiny houses.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 352, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 41; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 7. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-02 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 5:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |