WA SB5385 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 3/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Effective date 3/19/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning telemedicine payment parity.
Title
Concerning telemedicine payment parity.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Effective date 3/19/2020. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Chapter 92, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |