WA SB5388 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-28 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a training course for campaign treasurers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a training course for campaign treasurers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-08HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-05HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-03-22HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-22HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-22HouseSGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-22HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2019-03-11HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2019-03-08SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-08SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-08Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-01SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-03-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-03-01SenateWM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-03-01SenatePublic hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM.
2019-02-21SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-02-20SenateSGTE - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-18SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback